RI H8115 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Smithfield Business Regulation (would Increase The Business Registration Fee In The Town Of Smithfield To Ten Dollars ($10.00) And Would Impose A Twenty-five Dollar ($25.00) A Day Fine For Operating An Unregistered Business.)
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Smithfield Business Regulation (would Increase The Business Registration Fee In The Town Of Smithfield To Ten Dollars ($10.00) And Would Impose A Twenty-five Dollar ($25.00) A Day Fine For Operating An Unregistered Business.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-05-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2012) | |
2012-05-02 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H8115.pdf |