RI H8114 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - House voted to recommit to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - House voted to recommit to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Domestic Relations - Adoption Of Children (would Address Consent To Adoption Requirements In Circumstances Involving Assisted Reproduction, And Also The Effect A Dissolution Of A Marriage Or Civil Union Affects Parentage Of A Child Resulting From Assisted Reproduction.)
Title
An Act Relating To Domestic Relations - Adoption Of Children (would Address Consent To Adoption Requirements In Circumstances Involving Assisted Reproduction, And Also The Effect A Dissolution Of A Marriage Or Civil Union Affects Parentage Of A Child Resulting From Assisted Reproduction.)
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Flaherty [D] | Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] | Rep. Peter Petrarca [D] |
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | House voted to recommit to House Judiciary | |
2012-05-24 | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2012) | |
2012-05-24 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-22 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2012) | |
2012-05-16 | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study | |
2012-05-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2012) | |
2012-05-02 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H8114.pdf |