RI H8109 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Be Known As "the Task Force On The Education Of Children And Youth In The Care Of The Department Of Children, Youth, And Families"
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Be Known As "the Task Force On The Education Of Children And Youth In The Care Of The Department Of Children, Youth, And Families"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-22 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-10 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | House read and passed | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-06-02 | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. | |
2010-05-11 | Introduced, referred to House Constituent Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H8109.pdf |