RI H8105 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Proclaiming April 4-10 Of 2022 To Be National Public Health Week In The State Of Rhode Island
Title
House Resolution Proclaiming April 4-10 Of 2022 To Be National Public Health Week In The State Of Rhode Island
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - House - Passage (Y: 51 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 16 N: 50 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 16 N: 50 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2022) |
2022-06-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2022) |
2022-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |