RI H8100 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the state would reimburse the school committees for the costs of providing student transportation services to public and private school pupils. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-04-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8100.pdf |