RI H8093 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Pawtucket to issue up to $2,600,000 in general obligation bonds for the renovation and repair of the senior center, public library, police and fire stations, city hall and other public buildings.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Pawtucket To Provide For The Renovation And Improvement Of The Senior Center, Public Library, Police And Fire Stations, City Hall And Other Public Buildings In The City Of Pawtucket And Authorizing The Financing Thereof, Including The Issuance Of Not More Than $2,600,000 Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness Therefor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Police/fire stations, city hall approval of amendment lc 005462/2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-17 | House | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-12 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-03 | House | House read and passed |
2014-05-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/03/2014) |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2014) |
2014-04-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |