RI H8089 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Cranston to issue not more than One Million Dollars ($1,000,000) general obligation bonds and temporary notes for the construction, improvement, renovation, repair, alteration, furnishing and equipping of public buildings.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Cranston To Finance The Construction, Improvement, Renovation, Repair, Alteration, Furnishing And Equipping Of Public Buildings In The City By The Issuance Of Not More Than $1,000,000 General Obligation Bonds And Notes Therefor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-25 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-07-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | House | House read and passed |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-07-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/09/2020) |
2020-07-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |