RI H8075 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation - Collection Of Taxes Generally (would Add The Town Of North Providence To Those Municipalities Where The Tax Collector Would Attach A Separate Motor Vehicle Excise Tax Certificate Upon Application For Any Municipal Lien Certificate)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation - Collection Of Taxes Generally (would Add The Town Of North Providence To Those Municipalities Where The Tax Collector Would Attach A Separate Motor Vehicle Excise Tax Certificate Upon Application For Any Municipal Lien Certificate)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-30 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2012-06-22 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-12 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-07 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-06-05 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2012) | |
2012-05-31 | Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-05-17 | House read and passed | |
2012-05-09 | Placed on House Calendar (05/17/2012) | |
2012-05-09 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-05-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2012) | |
2012-04-24 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H8075.pdf |