RI H8066 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensively regulates the use of unmanned aerial vehicles and the use of any information that they may generate.
Title
Relating To Criminal Procedure
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2016) |
2016-04-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H8066.pdf |