RI H8052 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $635,000 For The Department Of Environmental Management (this Joint Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of Six Hundred Thirty-five Thousand Dollars ($635,000) For Dem For The Removal, Disposal And Replacement Of Certain Aqueous Film Forming Foam.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $635,000 For The Department Of Environmental Management (this Joint Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of Six Hundred Thirty-five Thousand Dollars ($635,000) For Dem For The Removal, Disposal And Replacement Of Certain Aqueous Film Forming Foam.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-03-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8052.pdf |