RI H8044 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a comprehensive regulatory scheme for motor vehicle passenger services provided by transportation network companies which use digital network as software application services to connect passengers to transportation providers.
Title
Transportation Network Company Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 49 N: 7 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-05-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2016) |
2016-04-22 | House | Meeting postponed (04/26/2016) |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2016-04-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |