RI H8044 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Miscellaneous Rules (would Amend The Sunset Provision Of The Statute Passed In 2011 Which Provides That Violation Of The Seat Belt Law Would Be A Primary Offense)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Miscellaneous Rules (would Amend The Sunset Provision Of The Statute Passed In 2011 Which Provides That Violation Of The Seat Belt Law Would Be A Primary Offense)
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Richard Morrison [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Jared Nunes [D] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-05-11 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2012) | |
2012-04-04 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H8044.pdf |