RI H8043 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing The Town Of Narragansett To Finance Improvements And/or Related Equipment For The Narragansett Athletic Complex And To Issue Not More Than $1,800,000 Bonds And Notes Therefor
Title
Authorizing The Town Of Narragansett To Finance Improvements And/or Related Equipment For The Narragansett Athletic Complex And To Issue Not More Than $1,800,000 Bonds And Notes Therefor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-11 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-05 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-05 | House | House read and passed |
2014-05-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2014) |
2014-04-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |