RI H8041 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Warwick to issue up to fifty-six million dollars ($56,000,000) in bonds/notes for schools/school facilities upon voter approval.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Warwick To Issue Not To Exceed $56,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Landscaping, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities Throughout The City, To Fund The Capital Improvement Program For The Fiscal Years 2022 Through 2026, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 35% At The Time Of Issuance And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By The Amount Of Certain Grants Received From State Bond Proceeds, From The Rhode Island Department Of Education Or From The Rhode Island School Building Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-25 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-07-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | House | House read and passed |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-07-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/07/2020) |
2020-06-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |