RI H8034 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a special license plate for Masonic Grand Lodge Charities of Rhode Island, specify the minimum order and govern the amount and distribution of the fee surcharge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Vehicles -- Special Plate For Masonic Grand Lodge Charities Of Rhode Island

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-22HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-05-09HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2018)
2018-03-30HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback