RI H8024 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Administrative Procedures (would Require A Cost/benefit Analysis And Periodic Review Of All Regulations Governing Or Impacting Small Businesses)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Administrative Procedures (would Require A Cost/benefit Analysis And Periodic Review Of All Regulations Governing Or Impacting Small Businesses)
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-13 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-11 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2012) | |
2012-06-06 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-06-04 | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2012) | |
2012-05-22 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-05-17 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2012) | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H8024.pdf |