RI H8023 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Public Finance Management Board (would Substitute September 30th As The Date By Which The Public Finance Management Board Would Submit An Annual Report On Debt Issues By Cities And Towns)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Public Finance Management Board (would Substitute September 30th As The Date By Which The Public Finance Management Board Would Submit An Annual Report On Debt Issues By Cities And Towns)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-18 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-07 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-06-05 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2012) | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-05-03 | House read and passed | |
2012-04-26 | Placed on House Calendar (05/03/2012) | |
2012-04-26 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-04-24 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2012) | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H8023.pdf |