RI H8013 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Amends provisions of law relative to motor vehicle replacement parts specifications time limits for using aftermarket body parts, and notification to the vehicle owner of the intention to use aftermarket body parts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Replacement Parts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-04SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseSenate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2018-06-23HousePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-19SenateHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-19SenatePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-19HouseHouse passed floor amendment only
2018-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-12HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-04-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2018)
2018-04-06HouseMeeting postponed (04/10/2018)
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-03-29HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback