RI H7985 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending The Charter Of North Providence
Title
Amending The Charter Of North Providence
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-04 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-17 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-17 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2014) |
2014-03-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |