RI H7983 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the chief judge of the family court to establish a program that requires that any divorcing or separating parties with children participate in counseling and educational programs to assist the children’s transition through the proceedings.
Title
Divorce And Separation
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2018) |
2018-04-24 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/25/2018) |
2018-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-03-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7983.pdf |