RI H7982 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Continues status quo for licensing of approved recipients under DACA program; however, issuance of license does not confer right to vote eff. 12/3/18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Operators' And Chauffeurs' Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18SenateSigned by Governor
2018-06-14SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-14HouseHouse passed Sub B in concurrence
2018-06-12HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/14/2018)
2018-06-12HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub B in concurrence
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-06-06HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2018-06-05SenateSenate passed Sub B
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/05/2018)
2018-05-29SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2018-05-25SenateScheduled for consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-04-12HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-04-10HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/12/2018)
2018-04-10HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for consideration (04/10/2018)
2018-04-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018)
2018-03-22HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback