RI H7964 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AND SALE - Allows for sending of the notice under power of sale and rights of active military servicemembers by USPS First Class Mail and/or an overnight delivery service, instead of by USPS certified mail return receipt requested.
Title
Allows for sending of the notice under power of sale and rights of active military servicemembers by USPS First Class Mail and/or an overnight delivery service, instead of by USPS certified mail return receipt requested.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7964.pdf |