RI H7949 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Elections - Voter Choice Act (would Add Two Members To The Voter Choice Study Commission For A Total Of 16 Members. This Act Would Also Extend The Reporting Date Of The Commission To May 1, 2013.)
Title
An Act Relating To Elections - Voter Choice Act (would Add Two Members To The Voter Choice Study Commission For A Total Of 16 Members. This Act Would Also Extend The Reporting Date Of The Commission To May 1, 2013.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2012-06-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-12 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-08 | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-05 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2012) | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-05-15 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-05-08 | Placed on House Calendar (05/15/2012) | |
2012-05-08 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2012) | |
2012-05-01 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-04-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2012) | |
2012-03-14 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7949.pdf |