RI H7947 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a three-year pilot program to assist students formerly enrolled in college to obtain college degrees, limited to no more than one thousand participants and delivered through a partnership between program facilitators and a program evaluator.
Title
The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Larry Valencia [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014) |
2014-03-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |