RI H7943 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the establishment of the repurposing of vacant and unused school and other municipal buildings for affordable housing program, within the Rhode Island housing corporation.
Title
Low And Moderate Income Housing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - Passage (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - Passage (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2022-05-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-05-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/19/2022) |
2022-05-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-11 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2022) |
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |