RI H7928 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Meeting postponed (03/11/2020)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Meeting postponed (03/11/2020)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person selling firearm to require purchaser execute a medical release form for release of medical records relating to addiction to controlled substance, alcoholism and/or mental health illness for a period of 5 years preceding application.
Title
Relating To Criminal Offenses-weapons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Meeting postponed (03/11/2020) |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7928.pdf |