RI H7917 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows an individual to access and learn what personal information about the individual has been gathered and stored by covered entities that conduct business in Rhode Island.
Title
Rhode Island Information Privacy Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2022) |
2022-03-10 | House | Committee transferred to House State Government & Elections |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7917.pdf |