RI H7916 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the state’s share to public libraries be fixed at twenty-five percent (25%) of the amount appropriated by the city or town in their budgets for fiscal year 2023, utilizing funds from the general fund or the American Rescue Plan Act.
Title
State Aid To Libraries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7916.pdf |