RI H7915 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definition of "Commission" to include the Cumberland local historic district commission.
Title
Historic Residence--tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-06-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2020) |
2020-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-06-11 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-06-10 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2020-06-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2020) |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2020) |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |