RI H7911 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts not-for-profit food banks from the registration requirements under the "solicitation by charitable organizations" statute.
Title
Solicitation By Charitable Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/16/2022) |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2022) |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2022-05-24 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-05-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-16 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2022) |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |