RI H7907 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Carl Gibeau to join Rashae Marie Melanson and Joel Owen Piggott in marriage on or about June 11, 2016 within the Town of West Greenwich, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/12/2016) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2016) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-03-22 | House | House read and passed |
2016-03-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/22/2016) |
2016-03-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2016) |
2016-03-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |