RI H7907 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Health Care Services--utilization Review Act (would Repeal The Sunset Provision Regarding The Statutory Variances The Department Of Health Is Allowed To Issue)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Health Care Services--utilization Review Act (would Repeal The Sunset Provision Regarding The Statutory Variances The Department Of Health Is Allowed To Issue)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-25 Effective without Governor's signature
2010-06-17 Transmitted to Governor
2010-06-11 Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
2010-06-10 Placed on Senate Calendar
2010-06-10 Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2010-06-02 Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
2010-06-01 House passed Sub A
2010-05-26 Placed on House Calendar
2010-05-25 Committee recommends passage of Sub A
2010-05-25 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2010-05-11 Committee recommended measure be held for further study
2010-05-11 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2010-04-28 Committee recommended measure be held for further study
2010-04-28 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2010-04-14 Committee recommended measure be held for further study
2010-04-14 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2010-03-16 Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback