RI H7899 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Urging Congress To Pass And Send To The States A Constitutional Amendment Permitting State And Federal Regulation And Restriction Of Independent Political Expenditures
Title
Joint Resolution Urging Congress To Pass And Send To The States A Constitutional Amendment Permitting State And Federal Regulation And Restriction Of Independent Political Expenditures
Sponsors
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Gordon Fox [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Rep. Larry Valencia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-05-24 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-05-23 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/24/2012) | |
2012-05-08 | House read and passed | |
2012-05-01 | Placed on House Calendar (05/08/2012) | |
2012-05-01 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-04-27 | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2012) | |
2012-04-03 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2012) | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7899.pdf |