RI H7894 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Rhode Island's Minimum Pricing Statutes (to Study Ri’s Minimum Pricing Statutes & Whether It Continues To Serve Their Original Purpose, & Whether Such Laws Are Putting Ri & Its Bus & Res At A Competitive Disadvantage Compared To Neighboring States, & Report Back By 1/17/13, & Exp 2/14/13.)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Rhode Island's Minimum Pricing Statutes (to Study Ri’s Minimum Pricing Statutes & Whether It Continues To Serve Their Original Purpose, & Whether Such Laws Are Putting Ri & Its Bus & Res At A Competitive Disadvantage Compared To Neighboring States, & Report Back By 1/17/13, & Exp 2/14/13.)
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Brien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-06 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/07/2012) | |
2012-06-06 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-06-05 | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2012) | |
2012-06-04 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2012) | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7894.pdf |