RI H7883 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- THE NICK ARJOMAND NO WEIGHT DISCRIMINATION ACT - Creates the Nick Arjomand no weight discrimination act. The purpose of this act would be to prohibit weight discrimination.
Title
Creates the Nick Arjomand no weight discrimination act. The purpose of this act would be to prohibit weight discrimination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee transferred to House Labor |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7883.pdf |