RI H7879 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- DEFENDING AFFORDABLE PRESCRIPTION DRUG COSTS ACT - Prohibits any health insurer, pharmacy benefit manager, or other third-party payor from discriminating against any 340B entity participating in a drug discount program.
Title
Prohibits any health insurer, pharmacy benefit manager, or other third-party payor from discriminating against any 340B entity participating in a drug discount program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Businesses And Professions
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- DEFENDING AFFORDABLE PRESCRIPTION DRUG COSTS ACT
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- DEFENDING AFFORDABLE PRESCRIPTION DRUG COSTS ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7879.pdf |