RI H7878 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Caps the total amount that a covered person is required to pay for a covered prescription asthma inhaler to fifty dollars ($50.00) per thirty (30) day supply.
Title
Prescription Drug Benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7878.pdf |