RI H7876 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets a goal for the habilitation facilities to participate in state procurements and construction projects of less than three percent (3%) of the total value of all contracts available to businesses in each fiscal year by June 30, 2022.
Title
Employment Of People With Disabilities
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2020) |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7876.pdf |