RI H7875 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- ACCIDENT AND SICKNESS INSURANCE POLICIES - Requires insurance coverage for all community health workers' services to include health and promotion coaching, health education and training, health system navigation and resource coordination services, care planning and follow-up care recommendations.
Title
Requires insurance coverage for all community health workers' services to include health and promotion coaching, health education and training, health system navigation and resource coordination services, care planning and follow-up care recommendations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7875.pdf |