RI H7840 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- The Rhode Island Economic Development (the Riedc & Its Subsidiaries Must Conform To Applicable Provisions Of The State Guide Plan / Require Projects Situated On Federal Land In The Town Of N. Kingstown, Edc Shall Refer The Plan To The Town's Director Of Planning For A…..)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- The Rhode Island Economic Development (the Riedc & Its Subsidiaries Must Conform To Applicable Provisions Of The State Guide Plan / Require Projects Situated On Federal Land In The Town Of N. Kingstown, Edc Shall Refer The Plan To The Town's Director Of Planning For A…..)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-08 | Committee postponed at request of sponsor | |
2010-04-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-01 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-04-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7840.pdf |