RI H7839 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-10 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-10 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regulates electric bicycles in the same manner as human-powered bicycles, classify electric bicycles into three (3) classes, require all electric bicycles to have a label affixed to the bicycle and be equipped with a speedometer.
Title
Regulation Of Electric Bicycles
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] |
Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-08 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-06-08 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2022) |
2022-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-27 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2022) |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |