RI H7828 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-23 - House voted to recommit to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-23 - House voted to recommit to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes minimum energy and water efficiency standards for certain products sold or installed in the state.
Title
Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers-the Energy And Consumer Savings Act Of 2005
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-23 | House | House voted to recommit to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-22 | Senate | House passed floor amendment only |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | House passed floor amendment only |
2018-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2018) |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee transferred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |