RI H7821 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the division of motor vehicles from refusing to re-register any vehicle for the current registrant, which has previously been registered in Rhode Island as prescribed in title 31.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7821.pdf |