RI H7821 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Procedures -- Criminal Injuries Compensation (act Make Various Changes For The Criminal Injuries Compensation Law Including The Awarding Of Compensation And The Nature Of Uniform Compensation)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Procedures -- Criminal Injuries Compensation (act Make Various Changes For The Criminal Injuries Compensation Law Including The Awarding Of Compensation And The Nature Of Uniform Compensation)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-10 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-10 | House passed Sub A | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-09 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-06-09 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7821.pdf |