RI H7817 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allows production of raw milk cheese in accordance with US FDA standards and under a permit issued by the director of the department of health.
Title
Milk Sanitation Code
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - Senate - Milk sanitation code approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - Senate - Milk sanitation code approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-13 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-08-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2016) |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |