RI H7809 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Jayne Marie Davolio to join Michael Alan Watson, Jr., and John Peter Rondeau in marriage on or about September 3, 2016, within the Town of Smithfield, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-05-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/17/2016) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2016) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-03-15 | House | House read and passed |
2016-03-08 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/15/2016) |
2016-03-08 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2016) |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |