RI H7803 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enables the creation of a public registry of home health aides, giving seniors and individuals living with disabilities another choice when accessing long-term care options.
Title
Quality Self-directed Services -- Public Officers And Employees -- Individual Providers Of Direct Support Services
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2018) |
2018-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |