RI H7800 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Quonset Development Corporation to establish a stormwater management and conveyance system and regulate connections, user fees, charges and assessments.
Title
Quonset Development Corporation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2014-06-11 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-05 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-01 | House | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2014-04-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2014) |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2014) |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |