RI H7795 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires office of Veteran Affairs to bear the cost of all tolls incurred by any motor vehicles that are part of a veteran's funeral procession, originating from Aquidneck Island and ending at the Veterans' Memorial Cemetery, for burial or internment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Military Affairs And Defense

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-26HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-23HouseScheduled for consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-06-20HouseMeeting postponed (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration
2018-03-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018)
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback