RI H7792 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Approving A Legislative Enactment Required By The Medicaid Reform Act Of 2008 (establishes The Medicaid Section 1115 Demonstration Waiver Requests And Renewals As Well As Any Initiatives And Proposals Requiring Amendments To The Medicaid State Plan.)
Title
Joint Resolution Approving A Legislative Enactment Required By The Medicaid Reform Act Of 2008 (establishes The Medicaid Section 1115 Demonstration Waiver Requests And Renewals As Well As Any Initiatives And Proposals Requiring Amendments To The Medicaid State Plan.)
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2018) |
2018-03-05 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2018-03-05 | House | Meeting postponed (03/08/2018) |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7792.pdf |